EP3326465 - USE OF BASALT FOR REDUCING FOULING AND/OR AS ANTIBACTERIAL MATERIAL, COATING FOR A SURFACE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovent e.V. Prüssingstrasse 27b 07745 Jena / DE | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFUCH, Andreas Louis-Braille-Straße 16 99510 Apolda / DE | 02 /
DÖPEL, Monika Markt 7 07381 Pößneck / DE | 03 /
RAMM, Max Rudolstädter Straße 7 07768 Kahla / DE | 04 /
SPANGE, Sebastian Am Heuweg 4 07586 Kraftsdorf OT Töppeln / DE | 05 /
GRÜNLER, Bernd Kirchstraße 14 07937 Zeulenroda-Triebes / DE | [2020/02] |
Former [2019/21] | 01 /
PFUCH, Dr. Andreas Louis-Braille-Straße 16 99510 Apolda / DE | ||
02 /
DÖPEL, Monika Markt 7 07381 Pößneck / DE | |||
03 /
RAMM, Max Rudolstädter Straße 7 07768 Kahla / DE | |||
04 /
SPANGE, Sebastian Dr. Am Heuweg 4 07586 Kraftsdorf OT Töppeln / DE | |||
05 /
GRÜNLER, Dr. Bernd Kirchstraße 14 07937 Zeulenroda-Triebes / DE | |||
Former [2018/39] | 01 /
PFUCH, Dr. Andreas Louis-Braille-Straße 16 99510 Apolda / DE | ||
02 /
DÖPEL, Monika Markt 7 07381 Pößneck / DE | |||
03 /
RAMM, Max Rudolstädter Straße 7 07768 Kahla / DE | |||
04 /
SPANGE, Sebastian Dr.-Behring-Weg 10 07548 Gera / DE | |||
05 /
GRÜNLER, Dr. Bernd Kirchstraße 14 07937 Zeulenroda-Triebes / DE | |||
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
PFUCH, Dr. Andreas Louis-Braille-Straße 16 99510 Apolda / DE | ||
02 /
DÖPEL, Monika Markt 7 07381 Pößneck / DE | |||
03 /
RAMM, Max Rudolstädter Straße 7 07768 Kahla / DE | |||
04 /
SPANGE, Sebastian Döbereinerstraße 13 07745 Jena / DE | |||
05 /
GRÜNLER, Dr. Bernd Kirchstraße 14 07937 Zeulenroda-Triebes / DE | Representative(s) | Liedtke, Markus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 17200781.7 | 09.11.2017 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | DE201610223453 | 25.11.2016 Original published format: DE102016223453 | [2018/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326465 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3326465 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/34, A01N59/16, A01N61/00, C09D5/16, C09D7/61, C08K3/36 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP);
A01N25/34 (EP);
A01N61/00 (EP);
C09D5/1618 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/34, A01N59/16, A01N59/20, A01N61/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | A01N59/00, C09D5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BASALT ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON FOULING UND/ODER ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLES MATERIAL, BESCHICHTUNG FÜR EINE OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BESCHICHTUNG | [2018/22] | English: | USE OF BASALT FOR REDUCING FOULING AND/OR AS ANTIBACTERIAL MATERIAL, COATING FOR A SURFACE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATING | [2018/22] | French: | UTILISATION DE BASALTE DESTINÉE À LA RÉDUCTION DES SALISSURES ET/OU UTILISATION DE BASALTE EN TANT QUE MATÉRIAU ANTIBACTÉRIEN, REVÊTEMENT POUR UNE SURFACE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 28.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2017 | AL | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 09.11.2017 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2005047403 (UNTERNEHMEN FUER SPEZIALFASERN [DE], et al) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202005003291U (SAKROWSKI KLAUS DIETER [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * claims 2, 8 *; | [Y] - Harel Thomas ET AL, "COPPER IN DECCAN BASALTS (INDIA): REVIEW OF THE ABUNDANCE AND PATTERNS OF DISTRIBUTION", (20110101), URL: http://www.fceia.unr.edu.ar/fisiografia/volumen79-81/BIFG_79-81_Alexander.pdf, XP055440692 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * |