Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3336487
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.04.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.03.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
13.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2020 |
First examination report |
|
03.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
04.01.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
19.12.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.05.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |