Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108205141B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | B | CN108205141 | 26.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102016225275 | 16.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3336487 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225275 | 16.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016225275 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225275 | 16.12.2016 |