Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10637188 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | B2 | US2019181585 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17205961 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109980403B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2021 | B | CN109980403 | 05.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17205961 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3496210 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2023 | B1 | EP3496210 | 12.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17205961 | 07.12.2017 |