EP3496210 - ELECTRIC PLUG CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2023/13] |
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Rainer Peter-Ulsch-Strasse 23 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Mader, Joachim, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 17205961.0 | 07.12.2017 | [2019/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496210 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496210 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/436, H01R13/52 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H01R13/4365 (EP,US);
H01R13/627 (US);
H01R13/42 (CN);
H01R13/424 (CN);
H01R13/426 (US);
H01R13/5202 (US);
H01R13/639 (CN);
H01R43/26 (US);
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2019/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER | [2019/24] | English: | ELECTRIC PLUG CONNECTOR | [2019/24] | French: | CONNECTEUR À FICHES ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 09.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1235306 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [I] 1,16 * figures 6-15 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032] *; | [I]US2010055961 (MARTIN GALEN M [US], et al) [I] 1,16 * figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] *; | [I]WO2013013967 (FCI AUTOMOTIVE HOLDING [FR], et al) [I] 1,15,16 * figures 1-14 *; | [Y]US2016197440 (SUZUKI MASAKAZU [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7-16 * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041] *; | [Y]EP3252876 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-16 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]EP3252875 (DELPHI INT OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG SARL [LU]) [A] 1-16 * figures 4-5 ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * | Examination | US2010285696 |