Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10429679 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B2 | US2018188603 | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW105143852 | 29.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6968684B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | B2 | JP2018109756 | 12.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | TW105143852 | 29.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108254947B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2020 | B | CN108254947 | 06.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | TW105143852 | 29.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3343282 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B1 | EP3343282 | 04.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW105143852 | 29.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201823819 | 01.07.2018 | A | TWI605287B | 11.11.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | TW105143852 | 29.12.2016 |