EP3343282 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsing Road Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2019/26] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Coretronic Corporation 11, Li-Hsin Rd., Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | ||
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Young Lighting Technology Inc. 1F & 3F, No. 11, Li-Hsing Road Hsinchu Science Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Chong-Yang c/o Young Lighting Technology Inc. 1F & 3F, No. 11 Li-Hsin Rd. Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | 02 /
WANG, Wen-Chun c/o Young Lighting Technology Inc. 1F & 3F, No. 11 Li-Hsin Rd. Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | 03 /
HSU, Hsiung-Chun c/o Young Lighting Technology Inc. 1F & 3F, No. 11 Li-Hsin Rd. Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 17207624.2 | 15.12.2017 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | TW20160143852 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: TW 105143852 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343282 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343282 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, G02F1/1334 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G02F1/1323 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/1334 (EP,US);
G02F1/133504 (US);
G02F1/133528 (US);
G02F1/133602 (US);
G02F1/133509 (EP,US);
G02F1/133626 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/27] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/27] | French: | AFFICHEUR | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 04.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2017 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | IE | 15.12.2019 | LU | 15.12.2019 | FR | 30.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
FR | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
FR | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
FR | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
FR | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
FR | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
FR | 30.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 15.12.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0918247 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010265435 (HWANG SEONG-YONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010289989 (ADACHI MASAYA [JP], et al) [Y] 5-10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0025] , [0027] , [ 0312]; figures 1,5, 10 *; | [XYI]WO2016195786 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-4,15,16 * paragraphs [0050] - [0075]; figures 5-11 * [Y] 5-10 [I] 3,4,11-14 |