Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10618231 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2020 | B2 | US2019202147 | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP51326 | 23.01.2017 | DE102016202012 | 10.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3414082 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2021 | B1 | EP3414082 | 19.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP51326 | 23.01.2017 | DE102016202012 | 10.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017137242 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016202012 | 10.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016202012 | 08.06.2017 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102016202012 | 10.02.2016 |