02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
03.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.07.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
15.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.11.2021 |
First examination report |
|
29.10.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
26.09.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.06.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
31.05.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
28.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
04.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
10.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|