Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020003366 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916564206 | 09.09.2019 | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201715472997 | 29.03.2017 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11242955 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B2 | US2020063916 | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916671666 | 01.11.2019 | US201715472928 | 29.03.2017 | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10508771 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2019 | B2 | US2017284602 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715472928 | 29.03.2017 | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10443785 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2019 | B2 | US2017284603 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201715472997 | 29.03.2017 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3436738 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2023 | B1 | EP3436738 | 06.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715472928 | 29.03.2017 | WO2017US24884 | 30.03.2017 | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201715472997 | 29.03.2017 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2969796T | 22.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201715472928 | 29.03.2017 | WO2017US24884 | 30.03.2017 | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201715472997 | 29.03.2017 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017173011 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715472928 | 29.03.2017 | US201662315434 | 30.03.2016 | US201715472997 | 29.03.2017 | US201662438746 | 23.12.2016 |