EP3436738 - IMPROVED METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING THE FILLING, STORAGE AND DISPSENSING OF CARBON DIOXIDE FROM MULTIPLE CONTAINERS WITHOUT OVERPRESSURIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 10 Riverview Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 10 Riverview Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | ||
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 10 Riverview Drive Danbury, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Xuemei 39 Wyndrock Lane East Amherst, NY 14051 / US | 02 /
CECULA, Shawn, M. 5898 Garlow Road Niagara Falls, NY 14304 / US | 03 /
GERRISTEAD, William, R. 262 Laurie Lane Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2023/49] |
Former [2019/06] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17716412.6 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017US24884 | Priority number, date | US201662315434P | 30.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662315434 P | US201662438746P | 23.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438746 P | US201715472997 | 29.03.2017 Original published format: US201715472997 | US201715472928 | 29.03.2017 Original published format: US201715472928 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017173011 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436738 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436738 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/00 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
F17C5/005 (EP,US);
F17C5/06 (US);
F17C1/00 (US);
F17C1/005 (US);
F17C13/002 (US);
F17C7/00 (US);
F17C7/04 (US);
B67D1/04 (US);
F17C2203/0639 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0646 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0648 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0138 (US);
F17C2205/0323 (US);
F17C2205/0338 (US);
F17C2205/0382 (EP,US);
F17C2221/013 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (US);
F17C2223/035 (US);
F17C2225/0123 (US);
F17C2227/043 (US);
F17C2260/021 (US);
F17C2260/022 (US);
F17C2260/042 (US);
F17C2270/0171 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0509 (US);
F17C2270/059 (EP,US);
F17C2270/07 (US);
F17C2270/0736 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER BEFÜLLUNG, LAGERUNG UND ABGABE VON KOHLENDIOXID AUS MEHREREN BEHÄLTERN OHNE ÜBERDRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGUNG | [2019/06] | English: | IMPROVED METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING THE FILLING, STORAGE AND DISPSENSING OF CARBON DIOXIDE FROM MULTIPLE CONTAINERS WITHOUT OVERPRESSURIZATION | [2019/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME AMÉLIORÉS POUR OPTIMISER LE REMPLISSAGE, LE STOCKAGE ET LA DISTRIBUTION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE ISSU DE MULTIPLES CONTENANTS SANS SURPRESSURISATION | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 30.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4100537 (CARLSON PETER B) [A] 1-21 * columns 2-4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010230436 (O'DONNELL KEVIN P [US]) [A] 1-21 * pages 1,2; figure 1 *; | [A]US2013180594 (SCHNEIDER DANIEL E [US]) [A] 1,7* figure 2 *; | [A]US8757437 (SCHNEIDER DANIEL E [US]) [A] 1-21 * columns 4,6-8; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2015153580 (GREENCO2 IP INC [US]) [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figures 1-6 * |