EP3452389 - PACKAGING, PACKAGING ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Össur Iceland EHF Grjothals 5 110 Reykjavik / IS | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSEN, Marcel c/o Ossur Iceland EHF Grjothals 5 110 Reykjavik / IS | 02 /
BOON, Liza A. c/o Ossur Iceland EHF Grjothals 5 110 Reykjavik / IS | 03 /
DE WAARD, Karim c/o Ossur Iceland EHF Grjothals 5 110 Reykjavik / IS | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17724466.2 | 04.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017US30988 | Priority number, date | US201662331503P | 04.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662331503 P | US201662419121P | 08.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662419121 P | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017192807 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452389 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452389 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/00 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B65D85/00 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (US);
B65D77/22 (US);
B65D77/30 (US);
A61B2050/3011 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG, VERPACKUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/11] | English: | PACKAGING, PACKAGING ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME | [2019/11] | French: | EMBALLAGE, ENSEMBLE D'EMBALLAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 06.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2017 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | ES | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | TR | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IE | 04.05.2021 | LU | 04.05.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.05.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
TR | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.05.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 04.05.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP0931732 (SILVA PRODUCTION AB [SE]) [X] 1-5,7,10,13-15 * paragraph [0034]; figure 3 * [A] 11,12 [I] 6,8,9; | [XI]US2007209957 (GLENN SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10-15 * figure 9 * [I] 4-6,8,9; | [XAI]US2010078347 (BRINKER BENJAMIN [US]) [X] 1 * figure 16 * [A] 11,12[I] 2-10,13-15 |