15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
28.02.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
24.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.10.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
09.08.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
09.08.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
18.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
08.03.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.03.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
13.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|