Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10883023 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2021 | B2 | US2020317966 | 08.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | US201716305245 | 02.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102353033B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2022 | B1 | KR20190013859 | 11.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6843890B | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | B2 | JP2019518115 | 27.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109476968B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2021 | B | CN109476968 | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017275646B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2021 | B2 | AU2017275646 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3464500 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP3464500 | 10.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018074647 | 06.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2795056T | 20.11.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US35593 | 02.06.2017 | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017210507 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662345433 | 03.06.2016 |