EP3464500 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG-WATSON, Ling 2301 N. Brazosport Blvd. Freeport TX 77541 / US | 02 /
JIN, Yi 2301 N. Brazosport Blvd. Freeport TX 77541 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/14] |
Former [2019/15] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17732270.8 | 02.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35593 | Priority number, date | US201662345433P | 03.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662345433 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017210507 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464500 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464500 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09J123/14, C08L23/14, C08L23/06, C08F4/659 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C09J123/142 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP,KR);
C08L23/06 (EP,KR);
C08L2205/04 (US);
C09J2301/312 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/64193 (EP);
C08L23/142, C08L23/06 (EP);
C09J123/142, C08L23/06 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/29 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/15] | C09J123/14, C08L23/14, C08L23/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/15] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION | [2019/15] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2017 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | IE | 02.06.2020 | LU | 02.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.06.2017 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.06.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.06.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.06.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010138253 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * * tables 1,2 * * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]WO2012149391 (ADHERENT LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,11 * * examples 1-31 * * tables 1,3 * * page 1, line 11 - line 14 *; | [A]WO2014046834 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * * tables 1-7 ** paragraph [0151] * | by applicant | WO2016029006 | - BERNHARD WUNDERLICH, "The Basis of Thermal Analysis", BERNHARD WUNDERLICH, Edith A. Turi, Thermal Characterization of Polymeric Materials, 2nd ed.,, (19970000), vol. 92, pages 277 - 278 | - BERNHARD; WUNDERLICH, "The Basis of Thermal Analysis", BERNHARD; WUNDERLICH, Edith A. Turi, Thermal Characterization of Polymeric Materials, 2nd ed.,, (19970000), vol. 92, pages 278 - 279 | - TH.G. SCHOLTE; N.L.J. MEIJERINK; H.M. SCHOFFELEERS; A.M.G. BRANDS, J. Appl. Polym. Sci., (19840000), vol. 29, page 3763 3782 | - E.P. OTOCKA; R.J. ROC; N.Y. HELLMAN; P.M. MUGLIA, Macromolecules, (19710000), vol. 4, page 507 | - S. DI MARTINO; M. KELCHTERMANS, Appl. Polym. Sci., (19950000), vol. 56, pages 1781 - 1787 | - V. BUSICO; R. CIPULLO, Prog. Polym. Sci., (20010000), vol. 26, pages 443 - 533 |