|
24.01.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2022 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |
|
27.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
19 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |