28.04.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
25.01.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.08.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.04.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.12.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2020 |
First examination report |
|
29.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
19.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
12.04.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.04.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
06.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
25.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|