Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019167198 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP65856 | 27.06.2017 | DE102016112391 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3481295 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP65856 | 27.06.2017 | DE102016112391 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018007206 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016112391 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016112391 | 25.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016112391 | 06.07.2016 |