19.08.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
12.08.2022 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.04.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.12.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.07.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.06.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
26.06.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
24.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.04.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
05.04.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.11.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
09.11.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.11.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
15.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
14.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|