EP3411457 - A POLYMER COMPOSITION COMPRISING A FIRE SUPPRESSANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deflamo AB Vàstra Kajen 8 37431 Karlshamn / SE | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTIN, Fredrik Hammarby Kaj 4 lgh 1701 120 32 Stockholm / SE | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17747863.3 | 02.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017SE00007 | Priority number, date | SE20160030019 | 03.02.2016 Original published format: SE 1630019 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017135862 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411457 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/04, C08K3/32, C08K5/09 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
C08K3/32 (EP,KR,SE,US);
C09K21/04 (EP,KR,SE,US);
C08K5/0066 (KR);
C08K13/02 (US);
C08F14/00 (US);
C08K3/016 (SE);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,KR,SE,US);
C08K5/092 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08L27/02 (KR);
C09K21/06 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2206 (US);
C08K2003/2224 (US);
C08K2003/262 (US);
C08K2003/265 (US);
C08K2003/267 (US);
C08K2003/321 (US);
C08K2003/329 (US);
C08K2201/005 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Title | German: | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM FLAMMSCHUTZMITTEL | [2020/31] | English: | A POLYMER COMPOSITION COMPRISING A FIRE SUPPRESSANT | [2018/50] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT UN AGENT RETARDEUR DE FLAMME | [2020/31] |
Former [2018/50] | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM LÖSCHMITTEL | ||
Former [2018/50] | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT UN AGENT EXTINCTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 28.02.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2062904 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] - [0006] *; | [XI]US2010087572 (NILSSON MATS [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12-14 * paragraph [0101]; claim 1 * [I] 3,7,11,15 | International search | [A]US4559372 (GIROUD-ABEL BRUNO [FR]) [A] 1-20 * ; claims 1-2,6,8-9 *; | [A]US6753363 (HARASHINA HATSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-20* ; column 35, line 63 - column 36, line 5; claims 1-3 *; | [A]JP3672368B (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-20 * , WPI abstract; Machine translation: claim 1; [0030] *; | [A]US2005256234 (KURUMATANI HARUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; claim 14 *; | [A]US2007289752 (BECK MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; paragraph [0003]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2010168295 (BREINER CHRISTINE [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * , claims 1,5 *; | [A]JP5032731B (POLYPLASTICS KK) [A] 1-20 * , WPI abstract; Machine translation: claim 1 *; | [A]JP2015160901 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , WPI abstract; Machine translation: claims 1-2 and 5; [0049] *; | [A]US2015322195 (MAKIDA TAICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; claims 1,11 * |