EP3416578 - TISSUE TREATMENT WITH PLASMA ARC STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medident Technologies Inc. 12968 - 21A Avenue Surrey, British Columbia V4A 8H5 / CA | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREGOSO, Gilbert 12968 - 21A Avenue Surrey, British Columbia V4A 8H5 / CA | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17752773.6 | 16.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017IB50889 | Priority number, date | US201662297633P | 19.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662297633 P | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017141192 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416578 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61B18/042 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/16 (US);
A61B2018/1226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | GEWEBEBEHANDLUNG MIT PLASMALICHTBOGENSTROM | [2018/52] | English: | TISSUE TREATMENT WITH PLASMA ARC STREAM | [2018/52] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UN TISSU PAR JET D'ARC PLASMA | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 18.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2011071517 (Konesky et al.) [X] 1, 12 * . Abstract, figure 1 . Paragraphs 10, 30 * [Y] 2-8, 11, 13-16; | [XY]US2015327963 (Fregoso et al.) [X] 1, 9, 10, 12 * . Abstract, figure 2 . Paragraphs 9, 10, 13, 18, 21, 22, 64, 70, 72, 74 . Claim 21 * [Y] 2-8, 11, 14-16; | [Y]US6094085 (Okayasu et al.) [Y] 13 * . Abstract, claim 1 *; | [A]US6494881 (Bales et al.) [A] 1-16 * . See entire document * |