Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10696557 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B2 | US2018354805 | 13.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160017998 | 16.02.2016 | WO2017KR01219 | 03.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6581305B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2019 | B2 | JP2019501094 | 17.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160017998 | 16.02.2016 | WO2017KR01219 | 03.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107848812B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2020 | B | CN107848812 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160017998 | 16.02.2016 | WO2017KR01219 | 03.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3296265 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2019 | B1 | EP3296265 | 06.06.2018 | A4 | EP3296265 | 21.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160017998 | 16.02.2016 | WO2017KR01219 | 03.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017142238 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160017998 | 16.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101966358B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2019 | B1 | KR20170096514 | 24.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160017998 | 16.02.2016 |