14.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.10.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
27.05.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
27.05.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
16.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
21.12.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
21.12.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
17.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
19.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|