Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019071551 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716084925 | 17.03.2017 | US201662310585 | 18.03.2016 | WO2017US22950 | 17.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019516646 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662310585 | 18.03.2016 | WO2017US22950 | 17.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109195906 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662310585 | 18.03.2016 | WO2017US22950 | 17.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3429961 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2019 | A4 | EP3429961 | 23.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662310585 | 18.03.2016 | WO2017US22950 | 17.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018011340 | 18.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662310585 | 18.03.2016 | WO2017US22950 | 17.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017161258 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662310585 | 18.03.2016 |