EP3516545 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING A DISTRIBUTED LEDGER FOR DATA HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R-Stor Inc. 12930 Saratoga Avenue D2 Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states R-Stor Inc. 12930 Saragota Avenue D2 Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRASHERS, Per, W. 2582 El Caminito Oakland, CA 94611-3008 / US | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 17780586.8 | 21.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017US52688 | Priority number, date | US201662397911P | 21.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662397911 P | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018057719 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516545 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L67/1097 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
G06Q20/405 (US);
G06F16/2246 (US);
G06F16/2255 (US);
G06F21/1078 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | G06F17/30, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES VERTEILTEN LEDGERS ZUR DATENHANDHABUNG | [2019/31] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING A DISTRIBUTED LEDGER FOR DATA HANDLING | [2019/31] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION D'UN REGISTRE DISTRIBUÉ POUR LA GESTION DE DONNÉES | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 23.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/08] | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2016028552 (SPANOS NIKOLAOS [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0079] *; | [A]US2016254906 (CASTELLUCCI RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0107] *; | [A] - Shawn Wilkinson, "Storj A Peer-to-Peer Cloud Storage Network", (20141215), pages 1 - 18, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160310101856/https://storj.io/storj.pdf, (20171128), XP055429592 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - Karthikeyan Bhargavan, "Merkle Hash Trees for Distributed Audit Logs Subject proposed by Karthikeyan Bhargavan", (20150407), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://pauillac.inria.fr/~fpottier/X/INF441/projets/merkle/merkle.pdf, (20171129), XP055430177 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * |