|
15.09.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
11.03.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |