13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
17.09.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
09.10.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
11.09.2020 |
Change - inventor |
|
11.09.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
08.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.05.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
15.05.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
18.03.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.01.2020 |
First examination report |
|
05.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.03.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
08.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
08.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
15.02.2019 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
25.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
25.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
15.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
24.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|