Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020020980 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN98784 | 24.08.2017 | CN201710486002 | 23.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3447838 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2020 | B1 | EP3447838 | 10.04.2019 | A4 | EP3447838 | 27.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN98784 | 24.08.2017 | CN201710486002 | 23.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018232979 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710486002 | 23.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109119686B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2020 | B | CN109119686 | 01.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710486002 | 23.06.2017 |