EP3447838 - LITHIUM IRON PHOSPHATE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | [2020/42] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 1, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Shaojie No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Changlong No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
JU, Feng No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Cui No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | [2020/46] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
TIAN, Shaojie No.1 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
HAN, Changlong No.1 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
JU, Feng No.1 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Cui No.1 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/46] |
Former [2019/09] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17784825.6 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017CN98784 | Priority number, date | CN201710486002 | 23.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710486002 | [2019/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018232979 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447838 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447838 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0566, H01M4/58, H01M4/583, H01M10/0567 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/0567 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0566 (CN);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M4/583 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | H01M10/0566 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUM-EISENPHOSPHAT-BATTERIE | [2019/09] | English: | LITHIUM IRON PHOSPHATE BATTERY | [2019/09] | French: | BATTERIE LITHIUM-PHOSPHATE DE FER | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | Translation filed | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 26.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2017 | AL | 11.11.2020 | AT | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | ES | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | IT | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | NL | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SE | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | NO | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.08.2017 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.08.2017 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN102983358 (INST OF CHEMICAL POWER RESOURCES, et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs 6-8, 13, 17, 20, 25, 30-32 *; | [Y]CN105789611 (HEFEI GUOXUAN HIGH-TECH POWER ENERGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs 15-19 * | International search | [Y]CN101394008 (GUANGZHOU GODSEND HI TECH CO L [CN]) [Y] 10 * , description, page 4, penultimate paragraph, the section of particular embodiments *; | [A]JP5472041B (MITSUBISHI CHEM. CORP.) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [Y]CN105789611 (HEFEI GUOXUAN HIGH-TECH POWER ENERGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description. paragraphs 0007 and 0015-0019 *; | [A]CN105789684 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [Y]CN106328996 (AUTOMOTIVE ENERGY SUPPLY CORP) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 0005-0006 and 0017 * |