16.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
08.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.09.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
21.06.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
21.06.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
28.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
25.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
08.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
09.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|