Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018282612 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816002215 | 07.06.2018 | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109312618 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US28075 | 18.04.2017 | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3019214 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US28075 | 18.04.2017 | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3445945 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2019 | A4 | EP3445945 | 27.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US28075 | 18.04.2017 | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017184571 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10017684 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2018 | B2 | US2017306217 | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 |