EP3445945 - METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR HYDRAULIC FRACTURING AND FOR TRACING FORMATION WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectrum Tracer Services LLC 9111 East Pine Street Suite 104 Tulsa, OK 74115 / US | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RULE, Jeffrey David 18120 South Elm Road Claremore, OK 74019 / US | 02 /
FAUROT, Steve, Allen 15741 Cherokee Street Skiatook, OK 74070 / US | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17786448.5 | 18.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017US28075 | Priority number, date | US201615133465 | 20.04.2016 Original published format: US201615133465 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017184571 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3445945 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/10, E21B43/26, G01N33/24, C09K8/03, C09K8/62 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
C09K8/62 (EP,US);
C09K8/03 (EP,US);
C09K8/70 (EP,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,US);
E21B43/267 (US);
E21B47/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | E21B47/10, E21B43/26, G01N33/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR HYDRAULISCHE FRAKTURIERUNG UND ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON LAGERSTÄTTENWASSER | [2019/09] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR HYDRAULIC FRACTURING AND FOR TRACING FORMATION WATER | [2019/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET COMPOSITIONS DE FRACTURATION HYDRAULIQUE ET DE TRAÇAGE D'EAU DE FORMATION | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 22.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006047478 (CORE LAB L P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,12 * page 2, paragraph [0006], page 6, paragraphs [0019] and [0020], page 9, paragraph [0024], page 15, paragraph [0047] through page 16, paragraph [0048], Examples, claims * [I] 5,8,9,11,13-15; | [A]US2011260051 (PREUDHOMME HUGUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013078031 (GUPTA D V SATYANARAYANA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2015069596 (SPECTRUM TRACER SERVICES LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 3, paragraph [0010] through page 4, paragraph [0017], page 5, paragraph [0021] through page 6, paragraph [0025], page 7, paragraphs [0029]-[0031], claims * [I] 5,9 | International search | [A]US2010307744 (COCHET THOMAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2013084643 (COMMARIEU ANNIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [X]US2015323515 (RULE JEFFREY DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 11, 15-19 * entire document * |