15.01.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
13.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
09.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
21.02.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
05.12.2019 |
First examination report |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.05.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
26.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
26.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.03.2019 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
22.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
11.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
05.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|