Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018293661 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN73545 | 15.02.2017 | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102107920B | Global Dossier | 08.05.2020 | B1 | KR20180082486 | 18.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN73545 | 15.02.2017 | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6567088B | Global Dossier | 28.08.2019 | B2 | JP2019503519 | 07.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN73545 | 15.02.2017 | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017254841 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN73545 | 15.02.2017 | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3460740 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2019 | A4 | EP3460740 | 27.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN73545 | 15.02.2017 | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201709014S | 30.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN73545 | 15.02.2017 | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018107576 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106600424 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017101869 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | A4 | Priority number | Date | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI660319B | 21.05.2019 | B | TW201824124 | 01.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 |