EP3460740 - DATA VERIFICATION-BASED REMINDER METHOD, DEVICE, AND TERMINAL, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ping An Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Jie Ping An Building No.3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Ning Ping An Building No.3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
FENG, Yuyang Ping An Building No.3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
LING, Jian Ping An Building No.3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
JIANG, Yunpeng Ping An Building No.3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17790662.5 | 15.02.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017CN73545 | Priority number, date | CN201611158961 | 15.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611158961 | [2019/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018107576 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460740 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/08, G06Q30/06, G06Q10/06 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06Q10/06311 (KR);
G06F16/2365 (US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/10 (KR);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | G06Q40/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | AUF DATENÜBERPRÜFUNG BASIERENDES ERINNERUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄT SOWIE COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/13] | English: | DATA VERIFICATION-BASED REMINDER METHOD, DEVICE, AND TERMINAL, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET TERMINAL DE RAPPEL BASÉS SUR LA VÉRIFICATION DE DONNÉES, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2017 | Translation filed | 06.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2017 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2020 | 14.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 24.09.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 18.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012239438 (HEMMINGS RICHARD A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 16] , [0 17] ** paragraphs [0045] - [0058] * | International search | [X]CN104463668 (NANJING BANGKEWEI INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1, 6, 11, 16 * , description, paragraphs 52-90 *; | [A]CN106021415 (CHINA CONSTRUCTION BANK CORP) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [PX]CN106600424 (PING AN TECH (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * , entire document * |