Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10898837 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2021 | B2 | US2019118123 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR04685 | 02.05.2017 | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113101736B | Global Dossier | 11.04.2023 | B | CN113101736 | 13.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201780027188 | 02.05.2017 | WO2017KR04685 | 02.05.2017 | CN202110400372 | 02.05.2017 | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109069958B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2021 | B | CN109069958 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR04685 | 02.05.2017 | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3453439 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2021 | B1 | EP3453439 | 03.04.2019 | A4 | EP3453439 | 13.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR04685 | 02.05.2017 | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2871798T | 02.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR04685 | 02.05.2017 | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017192002 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102572502B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | B1 | KR20170124217 | 10.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 |