EP3453439 - WATER TREATMENT DEVICE INCLUDING A STERILIZATION WATER DISCHARGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/11] | STERILIZATION WATER DISCHARGE DEVICE AND WATER TREATMENT DEVICE INCLUDING SAME | ||
[2020/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coway Co., Ltd. 136-23, Yugumagoksa-ro Yugu-eup Gongju-si, Chungcheongnam-do 32508 / KR | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jae-Man COWAY R&D Center Seoul National University Research Park 60 Nakseong-daero15-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08800 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, In-Du COWAY R&D Center Seoul National University Research Park 60 Nakseong-daero15-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08800 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Woo-Jin COWAY R&D Center Seoul National University Research Park 60 Nakseong-daero15-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08800 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Do-Han COWAY R&D Center Seoul National University Research Park 60 Nakseong-daero15-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08800 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Jin-Woo COWAY R&D Center Seoul National University Research Park 60 Nakseong-daero15-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08800 / KR | 06 /
YE, Byung-Hyo COWAY R&D Center Seoul National University Research Park 60 Nakseong-daero15-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08800 / KR | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17792904.9 | 02.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017KR04685 | Priority number, date | KR20160053832 | 02.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160053832 | [2019/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017192002 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453439 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453439 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/14, B01D35/16, C02F1/00, B67D1/07, // B01D61/02, C02F1/44, C02F1/46 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
C02F1/003 (EP,CN,US);
B01D35/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D35/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D29/92 (CN,US);
B01D35/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D35/147 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D35/157 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D35/1573 (CN,US);
B01D35/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D61/02 (EP,CN,US);
B01D61/025 (CN,KR,US);
B01D61/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D61/10 (CN,US);
B67D1/07 (US);
C02F1/001 (KR);
C02F1/441 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D2201/167 (CN,US);
B01D2311/2649 (CN,US);
B01D2311/2692 (CN,US);
B01D2313/12 (CN,US);
B01D2313/18 (CN,US);
B01D2313/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D2313/501 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C02F1/46 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2201/002 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2307/06 (KR);
C02F2307/10 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | B01D35/04, B01D35/16, B01D35/18, B01D35/14, B01D35/147, B01D35/157, C02F1/00, B01D61/02, C02F1/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABWASSERBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER STERILISATIONSWASSERAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | WATER TREATMENT DEVICE INCLUDING A STERILIZATION WATER DISCHARGE DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION D'EAU DE STÉRILISATION | [2020/45] |
Former [2019/11] | STERILISATIONSWASSERAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG UND ABWASSERBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | ||
Former [2019/11] | STERILIZATION WATER DISCHARGE DEVICE AND WATER TREATMENT DEVICE INCLUDING SAME | ||
Former [2019/11] | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION D'EAU DE STÉRILISATION ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU LE COMPRENANT | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2018 | Translation filed | 27.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 08.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2017 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | IE | 02.05.2021 | LU | 02.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | GB | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.05.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008202996 (ORANSKI MICHAEL [IL], et al); | [A]US2014230481 (YUN JONGHO [KR], et al) | International search | [A]KR0161071B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR19990016970U ; | [A]US2008190132 (VOGLEWEDE RONALD L [US], et al); | [X]KR20110061341 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20110127595 (WOONGJIN COWAY CO LTD [KR]) |