EP3439657 - METHODS OF TREATING BEHAVIORAL SYNDROMES USING PIPRADROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ovid Therapeutics Inc 1460 Broadway New York, New York 10036 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURING, Matthew 14 Cedar Lane Weston Connecticut 06883 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17803569.7 | 25.05.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017US34443 | Priority number, date | US201662341855P | 26.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662341855 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017205606 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439657 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4458, A61K45/06, A61P25/00, A61P25/26 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/4458 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP,KR);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | A61K31/4458, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTWICKLUNGSSTÖRUNGEN MITHILFE VON PIPRADROL | [2019/07] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING BEHAVIORAL SYNDROMES USING PIPRADROL | [2019/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE SYNDROMES DU COMPORTEMENT À L'AIDE DE PIPRADROL | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 28.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - COPPOLA M ET AL, "Research chemicals marketed as legal highs: The case of pipradrol derivatives", TOXICOLOGY LETTERS, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 212, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.TOXLET.2012.04.019, ISSN 0378-4274, (20120427), pages 57 - 60, (20120505), XP028428889 [X] 1 * page 59, column l, paragraph 2 * [I] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxlet.2012.04.019 | International search | [X]WO2008095253 (GOSFORTH CT HOLDINGS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4* , entire document. * |