Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
08.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.09.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.01.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 | Change - classification | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 | Change - classification | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
09.08.2019 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
09.08.2019 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.06.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.04.2019 | Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.03.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
08.03.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.03.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
18.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2018 | Change - representative | |
18.12.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication |