Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10421881 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2019112501 | 18.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201816166849 | 22.10.2018 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190016503 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190015753 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102359394B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B1 | KR20190015512 | 13.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019521212 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019519637 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019518836 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3464424 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2020 | A4 | EP3464424 | 10.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3464423 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2020 | A4 | EP3464423 | 10.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109415510 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109415508 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109312072 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025322 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3025179 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3023729 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3464422 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2020 | A4 | EP3464422 | 10.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018074855 | 06.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018074885 | 06.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018074915 | 12.03.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201810604Q | 28.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | WO2017US35997 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201810857P | 30.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35999 | 05.06.2017 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201810900S | 30.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | WO2017US35998 | 05.06.2017 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017214057 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017214056 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017214055 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10301506 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2017349713 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10280335 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2019 | B2 | US2017349706 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201615249294 | 26.08.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10106702 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B2 | US2017349782 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615249297 | 26.08.2016 | US201662346440 | 06.06.2016 | US201662346443 | 06.06.2016 | US201662347020 | 07.06.2016 |