EP3464422 - FULL SCALE PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYMER POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cymer-Dayton, LLC 411 Manufacturers Road Dayton, TN 37321 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-ASHER, Limor 206 8th Street Cresskill New Jersey 07626 / US | 02 /
NOGA, David Edward 363 Price Road Spring ciry Tennessee 37381 / US | 03 /
ZHU, Zhongliang 42940 Parkwood Street Fremont California 94538 / US | 04 /
BOUTON, Anderson 3415 Van Buren Street Chattanooga Tennessee 37415 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17810798.3 | 05.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35997 | Priority number, date | US201662346440P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662346440 P | US201662346443P | 06.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662346443 P | US201662347020P | 07.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662347020 P | US201615249290 | 26.08.2016 Original published format: US201615249290 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017214055 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464422 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10, C08G73/14, C08J3/00, C08J7/04, C08K5/17, C08L79/08, C09D179/08, C09D7/20 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C09D179/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/1035 (KR);
B01J2/02 (KR,US);
C08G73/1003 (KR,US);
C08G73/1028 (KR);
C08G73/1032 (KR);
C08G73/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/14 (KR,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/0008 (KR,US);
C08K5/17 (KR);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C09D5/1637 (KR,US);
C09D7/20 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | C08G73/10, C08J3/00, C08K5/17, C08L79/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IM GROSSEN MASSSTAB ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMERPULVERN | [2019/15] | English: | FULL SCALE PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYMER POWDERS | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ À GRANDE ÉCHELLE DE PRÉPARATION DE POUDRES POLYMÈRES | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 29.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4026876 (BATEMAN JOHN H, et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-14 * column 1, line 11 - line 38; claims 1-16 * * examples 4, 5 * [I] 5,6,11; | [XI]US4831104 (AYA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15 * column 1, line 13 - line 17; claims 1-15 * * examples 1-4; table 1 * [I] 5,6,11; | [XI]US5147895 (HUGHES O RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * column 1, line 13 - line 18; figure 1; claims 1-20 * * examples 1-3; tables 1, 2 * * column 3, line 5 - line 17 * [I] 6; | [XI]CN104109250 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-4,7-14 * page 1, line 16 - line 18; claims 1-9 * * example 16 * * page 15, line 35 - page 16, line 7 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]WO2015059047 (SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS USA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,12-15 * page 1, line 5 - line 10; claims 1-15 * * example 1 * * page 12, line 3 - line 7 * [I] 3,4,6,11; | [XI]AU2014256431 (EVONIK FIBRES GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-5,7-14 * page 1, line 4 - line 5; claims 1-14 * * example -; table - * * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 24 *[I] 6 | International search | [XY]US3267074 (WOOD NOEL V) [X] 1-3, 6-8, 17-18, 20-21, 23-24 * ; columns 5 and 6, figure on first page * [Y] 4-5, 9-10, 13-16, 19, 22, 25; | [Y]US4205162 (HERSCOVICI EVA J [US]) [Y] 1, 4, 10, 19, 23, 25 * ; columns 3-6 *; | [Y]US4259221 (PAUZE DENIS R) [Y] 13-15 * ; column 6 *; | [Y]US4480088 (PIKE ROSCOE A [US]) [Y] 1, 9 ,13-15 * ; column 3 *; | [Y]US5135974 (MOORE WILLIAM P [US]) [Y] 5 * ; columns 8-9 *; | [Y]US6232372 (BROTHERS PAUL DOUGLAS [US], et al) [Y] 16, 22 * ; columns 14-15 *; | [A]US6479581 (IRELAND DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 11-12* ; entire document * |