|
05.03.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2024 |
Request for a change to the title of the invention |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.12.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2023 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
21.11.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Request for a change to the title of the invention |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2017 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
58 |