Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11505111 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2022 | B2 | US2022032836 | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016990210 | 11.08.2020 | US202117451206 | 18.10.2021 | US201816309241 | 12.12.2018 | WO2017JP21847 | 13.06.2017 | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11186219 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2021 | B2 | US2020369199 | 26.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016990210 | 11.08.2020 | US201816309241 | 12.12.2018 | WO2017JP21847 | 13.06.2017 | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10773636 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2020 | B2 | US2019160996 | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP21847 | 13.06.2017 | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6551816B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | B2 | JPWO2017217420 | 11.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP21847 | 13.06.2017 | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6899100B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2021 | B2 | JP2019194089 | 07.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | JP2018523942 | 13.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109415012B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2022 | B | CN109415012 | 01.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP21847 | 13.06.2017 | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3470266 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP3470266 | 25.12.2019 | A4 | EP3470266 | 17.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP21847 | 13.06.2017 | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017217420 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016117828 | 14.06.2016 |