EP3470266 - ILLUMINATION APPARATUS, HOLOGRAM DEVICE, AND VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/16] | ILLUMINATING DEVICE, HOLOGRAM ELEMENT, AND VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD | ||
[2023/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Shumpei c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
KURASHIGE, Makio c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
NAKATSUGAWA, Kaori c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Tomoe c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/08] |
Former [2019/16] | 01 /
NISHIO, Shumpei c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
KURASHIGE, Makio c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKATSUGAWA, Kaori c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | |||
04 /
SATO, Tomoe c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17813316.1 | 13.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017JP21847 | Priority number, date | JP20160117828 | 14.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016117828 | [2019/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017217420 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470266 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3470266 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/00, G03H1/22, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/04, F21S2/00, G02B5/18, G02B5/32, B60Q1/50, // G03H1/02, B60Q1/08, B60Q1/14, B60Q1/24, B60Q9/00, F21S41/125, F21S41/16, F21S41/20, F21S41/675, F21S43/13, F21W102/135, F21W102/17, F21W103/60, F21S43/20 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G03H1/0005 (EP,US);
B60Q1/00 (US);
B60Q1/04 (US);
B60Q1/0408 (US);
B60Q1/085 (EP);
B60Q1/143 (EP);
B60Q1/245 (EP,US);
B60Q9/008 (EP);
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21S41/125 (EP);
F21S41/16 (EP);
F21S41/285 (EP);
F21S41/675 (EP);
F21S43/13 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP);
G02B5/18 (EP,US);
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
G03H1/2249 (EP);
B60Q2300/054 (EP);
B60Q2300/056 (EP);
B60Q2300/112 (EP);
B60Q2300/114 (EP);
B60Q2300/14 (EP);
B60Q2300/314 (EP);
B60Q2300/32 (EP);
B60Q2300/324 (EP);
B60Q2300/45 (EP);
B60Q2400/50 (EP,US);
F21W2102/135 (EP);
F21W2102/17 (EP);
F21W2103/60 (EP);
G03H2001/0224 (EP);
G03H2001/2221 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/04, F21S2/00, G02B5/18, G02B5/32, B60Q1/50, G03H1/00, G03H1/22, // G03H1/02 | ||
Former IPC [2019/16] | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/04, F21S2/00, F21S8/12, G02B5/18, G02B5/32, F21W101/10, F21W101/14, F21Y115/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/31] | English: | ILLUMINATION APPARATUS, HOLOGRAM DEVICE, AND VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD | [2024/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2023/31] |
Former [2019/16] | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, HOLOGRAMMELEMENT UND FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/16] | ILLUMINATING DEVICE, HOLOGRAM ELEMENT, AND VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD | ||
Former [2019/16] | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE, ÉLÉMENT D'HOLOGRAMME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2019 | Translation filed | 10.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2023 | 29.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015009695 (CHRISTMAS JAMIESON [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9,10,12-16,22 * abstract * * figures 4-9 * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0113] * [I] 2,7,8,11,17,19-21; | [XI]JP2016088395 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,22 * the whole document *[I] 2,7-21 | International search | [Y]JP2005326963 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [Y] 18-20 * , paragraphs [0084] to [0156]; fig. 1 to 11 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008247210 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 21 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0028]; fig. 13 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009126433 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 17 * , paragraph [0033] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015049380 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 7-21 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2016088395 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 3-6, 22-25 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0081]; fig. 1 to 13 (Family: none) * [Y] 7-21; | [A]JP2016088397 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-2* , paragraphs [0015] to [0057]; fig. 1 to 9 (Family: none) * | Examination | WO2013090209 | US2013278988 | WO2013163107 |