EP3541476 - SKIN ENGAGING MEMBER COMPRISING ETHYLENE VINYL ACETATE AND A FRAGRANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company LLC One Gillette Park Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiandong One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 02 /
BRADFORD, Valerie Jean One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 03 /
HAYES, Keesha Alicia One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 04 /
MOLONEY, Michael John One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 05 /
RIES, Peter Michael One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 06 /
SPOONER-FLEMING, Joia Kirin One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 07 /
HUTCHINS, Virginia Tzung-Hwei One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 08 /
DUBOIS, Zerlina Guzdar One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 17825633.5 | 17.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US62124 | Priority number, date | US201662423508P | 17.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662423508 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018094124 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541476 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q9/02, A61K8/81, A61K8/86, B26B21/44, C08L23/08 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/8135 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q9/02 (EP,US);
B26B21/443 (EP,US);
A61K2800/56 (US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US);
A61K2800/87 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | HAUTKONTAKTGLIED MIT ETHYLENVINYLACETAT UND EINEM DUFTSTOFF | [2022/48] | English: | SKIN ENGAGING MEMBER COMPRISING ETHYLENE VINYL ACETATE AND A FRAGRANCE | [2019/39] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONTACT AVEC LA PEAU COMPRENANT DE L'ÉTHYLÈNE-ACÉTATE DE VINYLE ET UN PARFUM | [2019/39] |
Former [2019/39] | HAUTEINGRIFFSELEMENT MIT ETHYLENVINYLACETAT UND EINEM DUFTSTOFF | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 21.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/42] | Request for further processing for: | 20.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9205929 (GILLETTE CO [US]); | [Y]WO2015148308 (GILLETTE CO [US]); | [Y]WO2016085729 (GILLETTE CO [US]); | [E]WO2017200990 (GILLETTE CO LLC [US]) | by applicant | US3111127 | GB1315626 | US3917613 | US3991178 | US4029759 | US4136163 | US4150052 | US4153679 | US4157384 | US4178459 | US4230688 | US4459425 | EP0310299 | US5095619 | US5134775 | US5266592 | US5349750 | US5451404 | US5454164 | US5551152 | US5608119 | US5653971 | US5665339 | US5703123 | US5711076 | US5713131 | US5725865 | US5843466 | US5956848 | US5977166 | US6161288 | US6295733 | US6298558 | US6298559 | US6301785 | US6302785 | US6365215 | US6442839 | US6451844 | US6449849 | US2003082219 | US6592884 | US2004181943 | US2005019356 | US6884903 | US6897195 | WO2005049553 | US6944952 | US6956139 | US7024776 | US7115282 | WO2006103401 | US2006225285 | US7121754 | US2006272155 | US7168173 | US7189760 | US7197825 | WO2007115593 | US2008034590 | US2008060201 | US2008069784 | US2008300314 | US7482373 | US2009049695 | US7581318 | US2009223057 | US7607230 | WO2011047211 | WO2011047221 |