EP3500998 - ELECTRICAL POWER MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cruickshank, Robert F., III 132 Cruickshank Road Big Indian, NY 12410 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17844165.5 | 17.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US47353 | Priority number, date | US201662377648P | 21.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662377648 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018039035 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500998 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/06, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H02J3/003 (EP,US);
G06F1/3206 (US);
G06F1/3296 (US);
G06F11/3062 (US);
G06Q30/0223 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
H02J3/00 (US);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
G06F1/26 (US);
H02J2300/20 (EP,US);
H02J2300/22 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02J2310/64 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
Y02B70/3225 (US);
Y04S10/50 (US);
Y04S20/222 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | G06Q50/06, H02J13/00, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | STROMVERWALTUNG | [2019/26] | English: | ELECTRICAL POWER MANAGEMENT | [2019/26] | French: | GESTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 22.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/09] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012209438 (CRUICKSHANK III ROBERT F [US]) [I] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2010083334 (INTEGRAL ANALYTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See claims 1-2, 8-10 and figure 1. *; | [Y]JP2013198360 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraph [0014], claims 4, 7-8 and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2014121849 (ANSARI NIRWAN [US], et al) [Y] 9, 17 * See paragraph [0092], claims 1-6 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2015145335 (LYREN PHILIP SCOTT [TH], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0035], [0042], [0045], [0069], [0081], [0083], claims 31, 35-37, 47 and figures 2, 4-6. *; | [Y]EP3032692 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraph [0073], claims 1-3, 9 and figure 1. * |