EP3524645 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR ORGANIC PIGMENT COMPOSITION, COATING FILM PRODUCTION METHOD, AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING BRIGHTNESS OF COATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M. Technique Co., Ltd. 2-16, Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-1144 / JP | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMURA Masakazu c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | 02 /
HONDA Daisuke c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 17858553.5 | 10.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017JP36711 | Priority number, date | JP20160199273 | 07.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016199273 | [2019/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018066717 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524645 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/20, C09B67/08, C09B67/46, G01N21/27, G02B5/20, C09B67/02, G02B5/22, C09K11/06, G02B1/04 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C09B67/0097 (EP,US);
C09B67/007 (EP,KR);
G01N21/474 (CN);
C09K11/025 (US);
C09B67/006 (US);
C09B67/0084 (EP);
C09B67/009 (EP);
C09D5/22 (US);
C09D7/41 (KR);
C09K11/06 (US);
G01N21/01 (CN);
G01N21/27 (KR,US);
G01N21/4738 (US);
G02B1/04 (EP,US);
G02B5/20 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | C09B67/20, C09B67/08, C09B67/46, G01N21/27, G02B5/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ORGANISCHE PIGMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTUNGSFILMS UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER HELLIGKEIT EINES BESCHICHTUNGSFILMS | [2019/33] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR ORGANIC PIGMENT COMPOSITION, COATING FILM PRODUCTION METHOD, AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING BRIGHTNESS OF COATING FILM | [2019/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE PIGMENT ORGANIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FILM DE REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE LA LUMINOSITÉ D'UN FILM DE REVÊTEMENT | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | Translation filed | 18.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1298165 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]); | [X]JP2003105226 (TODA KOGYO CORP); | [X]US2003116758 (MORII HIROKO [JP], et al); | [X]JP2007177200 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2009047936 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [X]JP4668090B ; | [X]JP2014206618 (SAKATA INKS) | International search | JP2007231247 [x] (FUJIFILM CORP)[x] 16,20-22; | JP2011068837 [x] (FUJIFILM CORP) [x] 17,20-22; | WO2011096401 [xa] (M TECH CO LTD [JP], et al) [x] 15-16, 20-22 [a] 1-14, 18-19; | JP2016084458 [x] (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [x] 16-17,20-22 | by applicant | JP2008268486 | JP2009112892 | WO2011096401 | JP2014126585 | JP2016061979 | WO2016JP77378 |