30.08.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
22.09.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
15.09.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.05.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.06.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.07.2021 |
First examination report |
|
26.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
24.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
24.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.03.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
10.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
09.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2019 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
30.08.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
30.08.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
26.08.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
26.08.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
24.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
03.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|