Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11864169 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | B2 | US2023232386 | 20.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117169170 | 05.02.2021 | US202318096734 | 13.01.2023 | US201916399240 | 30.04.2019 | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11558871 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2023 | B2 | US2021168802 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117169170 | 05.02.2021 | US201916399240 | 30.04.2019 | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10952214 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2021 | B2 | US2019387523 | 19.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4236167 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | A3 | EP4236167 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP17866655 | 19.10.2017 | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113472504 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110718550 | 04.11.2016 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113472503B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2022 | B | CN113472503 | 01.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110718546 | 04.11.2016 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3056162 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2022 | C | CA3056162 | 11.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3547751 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | B1 | EP3547751 | 26.08.2020 | A4 | EP3547751 | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2965139T | 11.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3547751T | 07.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN106918 | 19.10.2017 | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018082450 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108024293B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2021 | B | CN108024293 | 11.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 | Type | Divisional application | EP4236167 |