EP3547751 - TRANSMISSION BANDWIDTH CONFIGURATION METHOD AND TRANSMISSION NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIN, Yu c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Wubin c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 17866655.8 | 19.10.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017CN106918 | Priority number, date | CN201610963740 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: CN201610963740 | [2019/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082450 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3547751 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3547751 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/20, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04L27/2607 (CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0044 (CN,US);
H04W28/20 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | H04W28/20, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION DER ÜBERTRAGUNGSBANDBREITE UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSKNOTEN | [2019/40] | English: | TRANSMISSION BANDWIDTH CONFIGURATION METHOD AND TRANSMISSION NODE | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE BANDES PASSANTES DE TRANSMISSION ET NOEUD DE TRANSMISSION | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2019 | Translation filed | 03.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 03.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2019/40] | 23.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23171305.8 / EP4236167 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 22.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2398202 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * page 7, paragraph 0062 - paragraph 0065; figure 6 *; | [A] - ZTE, "Discussion on the usable bandwidth for guard-band NB-IOT", vol. RAN WG4, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-160176 DISCUSSION ON THE USABLE BANDWIDTH FOR GUARD-BAND NB-IOT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN4/Docs/, (20160214), XP051056607 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Mixed Numerology in an OFDM System", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160530), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165833, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160530), XP051112002 [A] 1-15 * figures 4-5 * | Examination | CN102036401 |